+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Became Law
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources