+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1366
April 12, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1366
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor