+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance