+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2016 - No Amendments
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
May 6, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1361
May 6, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1361
May 6, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1361
May 6, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1361
April 25, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1361
April 5, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1361
April 5, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1361
April 5, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1361
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor