+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment