+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services