+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor