+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 10, 2024 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 10, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Second Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On May 4, 2024 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2024 - No Amendments
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 25, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 22, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 19, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary