+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor