+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Finance
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor