+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1347
April 21, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1347
April 21, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1347
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor