+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 24, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 15, 2015: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005. The motion passed without objection.
April 15, 2015: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004. The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor