+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor