+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- First Conference Committee Result was to
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations