+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/20/2018 - No Amendments
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/18/2018 - No Amendments
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2018 - No Amendments
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor