+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2018 - No Amendments
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education