+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education