+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 31, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2014 - No Amendments
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2014 - No Amendments
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations