+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor