+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 26, 2016: Senate Judiciary: . .HB16-1337
March 28, 2016: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: . .HB16-1337
March 28, 2016: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: . .HB16-1337
March 28, 2016: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: . .HB16-1337
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor