+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor