+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legislative Council
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education