+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 30, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
April 22, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 6-5.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor