+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology + State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development