+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations