+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1329
April 7, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .HB16-1329
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor