+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1328
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1328
May 5, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1328
May 3, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1328
May 3, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1328
May 3, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1328
April 21, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1328
April 21, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1328
April 21, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1328
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor