+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations