+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education