+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (23)
May 5, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.005 The motion passed without objection.
May 4, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.047 (Attachment B). The motion passed on a vote of 6-3.
April 17, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1323, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 11-2.
April 17, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment M). The motion passed without objection.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.029 (Attachment J). The motion passed on a vote of 8-3.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.023 (Attachment E). The motion passed on a vote of 9-2.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment O). The motion failed on a vote of 3-8.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.027 (Attachment I). The motion passed without objection.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). The motion passed on a vote of 10-1.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.030 (Attachment K). The motion passed without objection.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.035 (Attachment L). The motion passed on a vote of 6-5.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.024 (Attachment F). The motion passed on a vote of 8-3.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment P). The motion failed on a vote of 3-8.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment R). The chair ruled that the amendment falls outside the title of the bill.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.034 (Attachment N). The motion passed without objection.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment Q). The motion died for lack of a second.
April 13, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment H). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor