+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services