+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services + Finance
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (13)
May 6, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1321
May 6, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1321
May 6, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1321
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1321
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1321
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1321
May 3, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1321
April 27, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1321
April 15, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1321
April 15, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1321
April 7, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1321
March 11, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1321
March 11, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1321
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor