+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (18)
May 3, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.027 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
May 3, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
April 25, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 004 (Attachment N). The motion failed on a vote of 6-7.
April 25, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 011 (Attachment M). The motion passed without objection.
April 25, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1318, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
April 25, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.003 (Attachment I). The motion passed without objection.
April 25, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 012 (Attachment K). The motion passed without objection.
April 25, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment H). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor