+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor