+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost - No Amendments
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/02/2014 - No Amendments
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor