+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment