+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 31, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 28, 2014: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1315 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
March 20, 2014: House Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001. The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor