+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 30, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion failed on a 2-2 vote.
April 30, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
April 22, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 22, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
April 16, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1313, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 10-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor