+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor