+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 31, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations