+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy + Appropriations
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor