+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection.
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1309, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
April 23, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1309, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 10-1.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor