+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor