+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor