+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor