+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment