+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to Legislative Council
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor