+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection.
April 22, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection.
April 22, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1306, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor