+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education