+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Governor Action - Signed
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Legislative Council
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs